Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Fiumi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622¹BornSan Angeli d’Aversa
23 Jun 168159.4AppointedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
24 Jun 168159.4Ordained BishopBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
22 May 169472.3DiedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Fiumi:
Bishop Ignatius Fiumi O.P. (born 1622, died ) Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum)

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 319
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 18 Apr 2015