Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Baldi, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1621Born
15 Jul 166947.5AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
21 Jul 166947.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
8 Oct 167957.8DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Baldi
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Baldi C.R.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Chioggia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopS. Charles ai Catinari, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 6 Nov 2018

Quantcast