Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Consoli

Deceased

Bishop of Bisignano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1627BornLagonegro
29 Mar 165325.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 168053.4AppointedBishop of Bisignano, Italy
13 Oct 168053.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bisignano, Italy
Mar 1706³78.8DiedBishop of Bisignano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Consoli:
Bishop Giuseppe Consoli (born , died Mar 1706) Bishop of Bisignano

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 119
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 17 Apr 2015