Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Bighetti

Deceased

Bishop of Patti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1607BornAgrigente
5 Jun 163224.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 167870.4AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
12 Apr 167870.4Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
May 1678³70.4DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Bighetti:
Bishop Antonio Bighetti (born , died May 1678) Bishop of Patti

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for .0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 302
  • c3: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 15 Apr 2015