Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pablo Jiménez Alejandro (Ximenes)

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622²BornArnedo, Spain
14 Mar 167856.2AppointedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
20 Mar 167856.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trani, Italy
21 Dec 169372.0DiedArchbishop of Trani, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pablo Jiménez Alejandro (Ximenes):
Archbishop Pablo Jiménez Alejandro (Ximenes) (died ) Archbishop of Trani

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 218, Number 1,352

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014