Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel de la Torre Gutiérrez, O. de M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1635³Born
9 Aug 168853.1AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
24 Aug 168853.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
21 Jul 169459.0DiedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de la Torre Gutiérrez
Archbishop Manuel de la Torre Gutiérrez O. de M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Lanciano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcalá de Henares, Spain

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 229, Number 1,428
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast