Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Giacinto Sangermano

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1638Born
1 Apr 167335.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 168042.7AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
13 Oct 168042.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
7 Jun 170264.4DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Giacinto Sangermano
Bishop Benedetto Giacinto Sangermano (born , died ) Bishop of Nusco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBisignano

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast