Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Pietra (Petria), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1619³BornMont San Sabin
21 Mar 164324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Jul 168162.3AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
31 Aug 168162.4Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
Nov 1703³84.6DiedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Pietra (Petria):
Bishop Pietro Pietra (Petria) O.S.B. (born , died Nov 1703) Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 163
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015