Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Pignatelli (Sr.), C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1652BornSenise
18 Feb 166917.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
27 Sep 168331.6AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
3 Oct 168331.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
20 Mar 170048.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
1703¹50.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
19 Feb 170351.0AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
17 Dec 170351.8Elevated to Cardinal
11 Feb 170452.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
26 Apr 171967.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
12 Jun 1724³72.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
19 Nov 1725³73.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
5 Dec 173482.8DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pignatelli (Sr.):
Francesco Cardinal Pignatelli (Sr.) C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 51.1 years
  • a cardinal for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1703
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015