Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marino Drago

Deceased

Bishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1655³Born
14 Nov 168530.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 168832.8AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
8 Jun 168832.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
7 Jul 169640.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Budua (Budva), Montenegro
1701¹45.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Budua (Budva), Montenegro
3 Oct 170853.1AppointedBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
9 Oct 173378.2DiedBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marino Drago
Bishop Marino Drago (born , died ) Bishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKotor

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 45.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 129, and Page 151
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 178, and Page 347
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast