Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Tansi

Deceased

Bishop of Nicastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617BornMateranen
22 Jan 168063.1AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
28 Jan 168063.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
3 May 169275.3DiedBishop of Nicastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Tansi:
Bishop Francesco Tansi (died ) Bishop of Nicastro

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 284
  • c34: CB, 17 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014