Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Zeno

Deceased

Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Feb 1660AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
22 Feb 1660Ordained BishopBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
14 Aug 1680DiedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Francesco Zeno:
Bishop Francesco Zeno (died ) Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 122, Number 743
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013