Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Jerónimo de Molina y Aragonés, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1638BornCastel d'Emposta, Spain
5 Mar 166223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
18 Apr 167839.5AppointedBishop of Malta
24 Apr 167839.5Ordained BishopBishop of Malta
25 May 168243.6AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
31 Aug 169859.9DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Jerónimo de Molina y Aragonés:
Bishop Miguel Jerónimo de Molina y Aragonés O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lérida

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 218, Number 1,353

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013