Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bonifazio Albani, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹Born
30 Jan 166851.0AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
19 Feb 166851.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
18 Feb 167861.1DiedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonifazio Albani
Archbishop Bonifazio Albani C.R.S. (born 1617, died ) Archbishop of Split (Spalato)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 361
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 Mar 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast