Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Fazio, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Patti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1630BornPalermo
20 Sep 165323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
26 Jan 168251.3AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
1 Feb 168251.3Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
6 Sep 169261.9DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Matteo Fazio:
Bishop Matteo Fazio O.P. (died ) Bishop of Patti

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 303
  • c34: CB, 17 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014