Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Flavio Macedonich, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Stagno (Ston)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1641¹BornBreno
27 Jan 168140.0AppointedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
23 Feb 168140.1Ordained BishopBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
14 Dec 168241.9DiedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Flavio Macedonich:
Bishop Agostino Flavio Macedonich O.F.M. (born 1641, died ) Bishop of Stagno (Ston)

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 18 Apr 2015