Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jan Kazimierz Cardinal Denhoff

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cesena, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1649Born
2 Sep 168637.2Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 168637.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
10 Nov 168738.4AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
14 Dec 168738.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
2 Jun 169747.9ResignedBishop of Cesena, Italy
20 Jun 169748.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Cesena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Jan Kazimierz Denhoff
Jan Kazimierz Cardinal Denhoff (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cesena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarsaw, Poland

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
  • a cardinal for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686
  • c34: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1687, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast