Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Batailler

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Bethleem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹BornToulon
1633²16.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1663²46.0IncardinatedPriest
28 Apr 166447.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
15 Jun 166447.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethleem
20 Jun 170184.4DiedTitular Bishop of Bethleem

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Batailler:
Bishop François de Batailler (died ) Titular Bishop of Bethleem

  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 114
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c2: CB, 30 Dec 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015