Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdinando Bazan y Manriquez

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1626¹BornPalermo
1 Apr 168660.2AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
7 Apr 168660.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
11 Aug 170276.6DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Bazan y Manriquez:
Archbishop Ferdinando Bazan y Manriquez (born 1626, died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 306
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 22 Apr 2015