Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspard de Lascaris

Deceased

Bishop of Carpentras


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Sep 1665AppointedBishop of Carpentras, France
4 Oct 1665Ordained BishopBishop of Carpentras, France
6 Dec 1684³DiedBishop of Carpentras, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspard de Lascaris:
Bishop Gaspard de Lascaris (died ) Bishop of Carpentras

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 136
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015