Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido Bentivoglio, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bertinoro


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Feb 1660AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
23 Feb 1660Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
1 Feb 1676ResignedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
1 Feb 1680DiedBishop Emeritus of Bertinoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guido Bentivoglio:
Bishop Guido Bentivoglio C.R. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bertinoro

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 122, Number 743
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Mar 2014