Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Nocella

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1826Born
2 Sep 184922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
21 Mar 189265.3AppointedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
22 Jun 189972.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
16 Jul 189972.6Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
18 Apr 190174.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
22 Jun 190376.5Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 190376.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
22 Jul 190881.6DiedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople

MicroData Summary for Carlo Nocella (VIAF: 89304152)
Carlo Cardinal Nocella (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Chapel of the Canons, St. Peter's Basilica, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
  • a cardinal for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 107, and Page 224
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 47
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jun 1903
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1899, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017