Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Gaspare Lancia di Brolo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1825Born
7 Jun 184620.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Aug 184822.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Mar 187852.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
28 Mar 187852.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
28 Apr 187852.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
24 Mar 188458.4AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
31 Jul 191993.8DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Gaspare Lancia di Brolo (VIAF: 233297035)
Archbishop Domenico Gaspare Lancia di Brolo O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Monreale

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Ordained BishopSan Paolo fuori le Mura, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 70.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 395, and Page 452
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,878, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast