Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Maria Merola

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1834Born
19 Dec 185723.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 189358.8AppointedBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
18 Jun 189358.8Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
24 Sep 191581.1DiedBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Maria Merola
Bishop Nicola Maria Merola (born , died ) Bishop of Isernia e Venafro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAscoli Satriano
Ordained BishopSt. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 326
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017