Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Innocente Giuseppe Fosco

Deceased

Bishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1826Born
26 Jul 184923.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Jul 184923.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Aug 187549.4SelectedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
7 Apr 187650.0ConfirmedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
7 May 187650.1Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
25 Mar 189468.0DiedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Innocente Giuseppe Fosco (VIAF: 243494598)
Bishop Antonio Innocente Giuseppe Fosco (born , died ) Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSebenico, Diocese of Šibenik (Knin)
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 517
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,876, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast