Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guglielmo Stagno di Alcontres

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy

Titular Bishop of Arabissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1841Born
18 Oct 186826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Messina, Italy
12 Jun 189351.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy
12 Jun 189351.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arabissus
18 Jun 189351.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arabissus
1904¹62.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Stagno di Alcontres
Bishop Guglielmo Stagno di Alcontres (born , died 1904) Auxiliary Bishop of Messina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina, Archdiocese of Messina
Ordained BishopSt. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 115
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017