Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Rinaldi

Deceased

Bishop of Montefiascone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1840Born
10 Jun 186525.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 189555.5AppointedBishop of Montefiascone, Italy
1 Dec 189555.5Ordained BishopBishop of Montefiascone, Italy
21 Apr 190766.9DiedBishop of Montefiascone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Rinaldi
Bishop Domenico Rinaldi (born , died ) Bishop of Montefiascone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRieti, Diocese of Rieti
Ordained BishopS. Silvestre des Monts, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017