Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz von Sales Maria Doppelbauer

Deceased

Bishop of Linz, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1845Born
26 Jul 186823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Linz, Austria
17 Dec 188843.9SelectedBishop of Linz, Austria
11 Feb 188944.0ConfirmedBishop of Linz, Austria
10 Mar 188944.1Ordained BishopBishop of Linz, Austria
5 May 188944.2InstalledBishop of Linz, Austria
2 Dec 190863.8DiedBishop of Linz, Austria

MicroData Summary for Franz von Sales Maria Doppelbauer (VIAF: 161775538)
Bishop Franz von Sales Maria Doppelbauer (born , died ) Bishop of Linz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaitzenkirchen
Ordained BishopS. Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 345
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1889, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017