Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giustino Adami

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea Ponti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1830Born
21 Jun 185726.5Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 189867.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea Ponti
2 Feb 189867.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea Ponti
13 Dec 190675.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea Ponti

MicroData Summary for Giustino Adami
Archbishop Giustino Adami (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Caesarea Ponti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino di Sangro
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 166
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1898, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017