Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Rota

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1834Born
20 Dec 185622.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 188854.2AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
11 Jun 188854.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
24 Feb 191378.9DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Rota (VIAF: 103210879)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Rota (born , died ) Bishop of Lodi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiari
Ordained BishopS. Charles au Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 335
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,226
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017