Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaetano Cardinal Aloisi Masella

Deceased

Pro-Datary of the Apostolic Datary

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1826Born
3 Jun 184922.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 187750.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
22 May 187750.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
3 Jun 187750.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
1 Aug 187952.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
25 Jun 188356.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
14 Mar 188760.4Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 188760.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
16 Nov 188761.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
3 Oct 188963.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
16 Jan 189366.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
29 May 189770.6AppointedPro-Datary of the Apostolic Datary
15 Jun 189770.7ResignedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
22 Nov 190276.1DiedPro-Datary of the Apostolic Datary

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Aloisi Masella (VIAF: 52863574)
Gaetano Cardinal Aloisi Masella (born , died ) Pro-Datary of Apostolic Datary

EventPlace
Birth PlacePontecorvo, Diocese of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
Ordained PriestSt John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopCollegio de Propaganda Fide, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Family's Tomb, Cathedral, Pontecorvo, Diocese of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
  • a cardinal for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 406, and Page 52
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Mar 1887
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 19
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 56, and Page 215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast