Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernesto Fontana

Deceased

Bishop of Crema, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1830Born
1 Apr 185423.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 189463.6AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
24 May 189463.6Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
4 Nov 191080.0DiedBishop of Crema, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Fontana (VIAF: 88863984)
Bishop Ernesto Fontana (born , died ) Bishop of Crema

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopCollege Lombard, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 230
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017