Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Nicora

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1829Born
5 Jun 185222.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 188858.7AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
11 Jun 188858.7Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
27 Nov 189061.2DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Nicora (VIAF: 89226800)
Bishop Luigi Nicora (born , died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopS. Charles au Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 218
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,225
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017