Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Ciceri

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1848Born
17 Dec 187022.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 190152.7AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
25 Aug 190153.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pavia, Italy
2 Jun 192475.8DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Ciceri
Bishop Francesco Ciceri (born , died ) Bishop of Pavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVill’Albese

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,925
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 439
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,901, Number 47
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 479, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast