Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marian Florczyk

Auxiliary Bishop of Kielce

Titular Bishop of Limata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1954 BornKielce
6 Jun 198126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kielce, Poland
21 Feb 199843.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland
21 Feb 199843.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Limata
18 Apr 199843.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limata

MicroData Summary for Marian Florczyk:
Bishop Marian Florczyk (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kielce

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kielce.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014