Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Józef Mirosław Życiński

Deceased

Archbishop of Lublin, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1948Born
19 Jun 197122.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Częstochowa, Poland
21 May 197223.7Ordained PriestPriest of Częstochowa, Poland
29 Sep 199042.0AppointedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
4 Nov 199042.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tarnów, Poland
14 Jun 199748.7AppointedArchbishop of Lublin, Poland
29 Jun 199748.8InstalledArchbishop of Lublin, Poland
10 Feb 201162.4DiedArchbishop of Lublin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Mirosław Życiński (VIAF: 102316822)
Archbishop Józef Mirosław Życiński (born , died ) Archbishop of Lublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNowa Wieś koło Rozprza, Diocese of Częstochowa
Ordained PriestHoly Family, Cathedral Basilica, Częstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa
Ordained BishopNativity of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral Basilica, Tarnów, Diocese of Tarnów
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Bishop's Crypt, St. John the Baptist, Cathedral Basilica, Lublin, Archdiocese of Lublin

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,596
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast