Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Huê

Archidioecesis Hueensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 24 November 1960
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Viet Nam
  • Square Kilometers: 12,227 (4,722 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Toa Tong Giam Muc, 37 Phan Dinh Phung, Tp. Hue, Viet Nam
  • Telephone: (054)824.937
  • Fax: 833.656

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}
27 August 1850ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Huê
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Huê
Archdiocese of Huê
24 November 1960ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Huê Archdiocese of Huê

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Huê
197076,138704,30010.8%16939208366129826ap1971
197941,1311,600,0002.6%726785272536553ap1991
199751,5601,593,0003.2%7711885857843453ap2000
200059,2701,967,4503.0%6610767796144753ap2001
200160,9821,966,6053.1%631679771100501177ap2002
200263,4541,987,2173.2%691786737100554177ap2003
200364,0422,007,3003.2%711788727105588177ap2004
200465,7701,977,3003.3%741993707107599177ap2005
200666,7002,150,7003.1%9222114585107631177ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 22 Jun 2013