Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville)

Archidioecesis Hochiminhopolitana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 23 November 1976
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Viet Nam
  • Square Kilometers: 2,093 (808 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Toa Tong Giam Muc, 180 Nguyen Dink Chieu, Q. 3, Thanh-Pho Ho Chi Minh, Viet Nam
  • Telephone: (08)3930.3828
  • Fax: 3930.0598

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}
2 March 1844SplitVicariate Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina} Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Saigon
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale} Vicariate Apostolic of Saigon
8 January 1938Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Saigon Vicariate Apostolic of Vinh Long (erected)
5 July 1957Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Quinhon
Vicariate Apostolic of Saigon
Vicariate Apostolic of Nha Trang (erected)
24 November 1960Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kontum
Vicariate Apostolic of Saigon
Diocese of Đà Lạt (erected)
24 November 1960Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Saigon Diocese of Mỹ Tho (erected)
Archdiocese of Saigon
24 November 1960ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Saigon Archdiocese of Saigon
14 October 1965Territory LostArchdiocese of Saigon Diocese of Phú Cường (erected)
Diocese of Xuân Lộc (erected)
Archdiocese of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville)
23 November 1976Name ChangedArchdiocese of Saigon Archdiocese of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Saigon
1949115,0002,500,0004.6%13531388339683816ap1951
Archdiocese of Saigon
1970507,7532,887,94317.6%3441554991,0176261,991128ap1971
Archdiocese of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville)
1979389,6043,500,00011.1%370444149413641,477201ap1991
1999524,2814,989,70310.5%2731694421,1869742,674186ap2000
2000541,3025,063,87110.7%2821714531,1941,0232,485188ap2001
2001558,5775,169,44910.8%2841744581,2191,1573,046191ap2002
2002573,3435,222,10011.0%2901944841,1841,2142,762193ap2003
2003583,2095,087,36511.5%2852014861,2001,4883,294194ap2004
2004602,4785,454,29811.0%2892305191,1601,6073,382195ap2005
2010671,2296,780,2179.9%3053276321,0622,1293,306199ap2011
2014683,9887,395,0789.2%3363887249442,1553,768200ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 Apr 2018

Quantcast