Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin-Marie Tardieu, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Quinhon

Titular Bishop of Vada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1872BornMontrodat, France
27 Jun 189724.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
19 Dec 192957.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Quinhon, Viet Nam
19 Dec 192957.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vada
1 May 193057.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vada
12 Dec 194270.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Quinhon, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Augustin-Marie Tardieu:
Bishop Augustin-Marie Tardieu M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Quinhon

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013