Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Kallarakal

Archbishop of Verapoly


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1941 BornKottapuram
29 Jun 196826.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kottapuram, India
3 Jul 198745.7AppointedBishop of Kottapuram, India
4 Oct 198746.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kottapuram, India
20 Feb 201068.4AppointedArchbishop of Verapoly, India

MicroData Summary for Francis Kallarakal:
Archbishop Francis Kallarakal (born ) Archbishop of Verapoly

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Verapoly.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,906

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 19 Feb 2014