Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugues-Madelain Bottero, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kumbakonam, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1837Born
20 Dec 185922.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
5 Sep 189962.6AppointedBishop of Kumbakonam, India
30 Nov 189962.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kumbakonam, India
21 May 191376.3DiedBishop of Kumbakonam, India

MicroData Summary for Hugues-Madelain Bottero
Bishop Hugues-Madelain Bottero M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Kumbakonam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChambéry, Archdiocese of Chambéry, France
Ordained BishopPondicherry, Archdiocese of Pondicherry
Death PlaceKumbakonam, Diocese of Kumbakonam

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 330
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast