Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cornelius Elanjikal

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Verapoly


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1918BornKarel
18 Mar 194526.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 197152.4AppointedBishop of Vijayapuram, India
4 Apr 197152.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vijayapuram, India
26 Jan 198768.4AppointedArchbishop of Verapoly, India
14 Jun 199677.8RetiredArchbishop of Verapoly, India
7 Aug 201192.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Verapoly, India

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Elanjikal:
Archbishop Cornelius Elanjikal (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Verapoly

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013