Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Thattumkal, S.S.C.

Bishop Emeritus of Cochin

Note/Previous Titular See: (Suspended 24 Oct 2008)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1950 BornArthunkal
3 Aug 197424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Priestly Society of St. Joseph Benedict Cottolengo
10 May 200049.9AppointedBishop of Cochin, India
25 Jun 200050.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cochin, India
8 May 200958.9ResignedBishop of Cochin, India

MicroData Summary for John Thattumkal:
Bishop John Thattumkal S.S.C. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cochin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cochin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,792

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013