Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrose Rayappan

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Pondicherry and Cuddalore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1901BornDharapuram
16 Dec 192322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Coimbatore, India
8 Jan 195351.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India
8 Jan 195351.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
25 Mar 195352.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
7 Aug 195352.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India
7 Aug 195352.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Selymbria
28 Nov 195554.7SucceededArchbishop of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India
17 Mar 197372.0ResignedArchbishop of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India
24 Nov 199998.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India

MicroData Summary for Ambrose Rayappan:
Archbishop Ambrose Rayappan (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pondicherry and Cuddalore

  • a priest for 75.9 years
  • a bishop for 46.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015