Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lubomyr Cardinal Husar, M.S.U. †

Deceased

Major Archbishop Emeritus of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sofia a Via Boccea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1933Born
30 Mar 195825.0Ordained PriestPriest of Stamford (Ukrainian), USA
24 Jun 197239.3ProfessedPriest of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
2 Apr 197744.1Ordained BishopBishop
22 Feb 199662.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nisa in Lycia
2 Apr 199663.1AppointedArchiepiscopal Exarch of Kyiv-Vyshhorod (Ukrainian), Ukraine
14 Oct 199663.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
23 Dec 200067.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
25 Jan 200167.9SelectedMajor Archbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
26 Jan 200167.9ConfirmedMajor Archbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
26 Jan 200167.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sofia a Via Boccea
21 Feb 200167.9Elevated to Cardinal
6 Dec 200471.7AppointedMajor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
6 Dec 200471.7AppointedArchbishop of Kyiv {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
10 Feb 201177.9ResignedMajor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
10 Feb 201177.9ResignedArchbishop of Kyiv {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
31 May 201784.2DiedMajor Archbishop Emeritus of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Lubomyr Husar (VIAF: 62723122)
Lubomyr Cardinal Husar M.S.U. (born , died ) Major Archbishop Emeritus of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLviv
Ordained BishopStudite monastery, Chapel, Castelgandolfo
Death PlaceFeofaniya, Hospital, Kiev, Archeparchy of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)
Buried Place (Original)Resurrection of Christ, Cathedral, Kiev, Archeparchy of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
  • a cardinal for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,665
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,730
  • d: CB, 31 May 2017
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)
  • aadm/d.loc: CB, 7 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Sep 2021

Quantcast