Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Taras Senkiv, O.M.

Bishop of Stryj (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1960 BornBilobozhytsia
28 May 198221.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 200646.2ProfessedPriest of Order of the Minims
22 May 200847.9ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Stryj (Ukrainian), Ukraine
22 May 200847.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Siccenna
20 Jul 200848.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Siccenna
20 Jan 201049.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Stryj (Ukrainian), Ukraine
2 Apr 201453.7ConfirmedBishop of Stryj (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Taras Senkiv:
Bishop Taras Senkiv O.M. (born ) Bishop of Stryj

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Stryj (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,933
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014