Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vasyl Semeniuk

Archbishop of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1949 Born
22 Dec 197425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
20 Apr 199343.7IncardinatedPriest of Ternopil (Ukrainian), Ukraine
10 Feb 200454.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
10 Feb 200454.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Severiana
3 Apr 200454.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castra Severiana
19 Oct 200657.2AppointedBishop of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
21 Nov 201162.3AppointedArchbishop of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
22 Dec 201162.3InstalledArchbishop of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Vasyl Semeniuk
Archbishop Vasyl Semeniuk (born ) Archbishop of Ternopil-Zboriv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDora
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ternopoli, Eparchy of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,569
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2006
  • ab: CB, 30 Nov 2011
  • i: CB, 20 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast