Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Meron Mazur, O.S.B.M.

Bishop of Imaculada Conceição in Prudentópolis (Ukrainian), Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1962 Born
10 Feb 198119.0ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1 Jan 198825.9Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
8 Sep 199028.5Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
21 Dec 200543.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian), Brazil
21 Dec 200543.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Simitthu
26 Feb 200644.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Simitthu
12 May 201452.2AppointedBishop of Imaculada Conceição in Prudentópolis (Ukrainian), Brazil
13 Jul 201452.4InstalledBishop of Imaculada Conceição in Prudentópolis (Ukrainian), Brazil

MicroData Summary for Meron Mazur
Bishop Meron Mazur O.S.B.M. (born ) Bishop of Imaculada Conceição in Prudentópolis

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrudentópolis
Ordained BishopSão Josafat, Church, Prudentópolis

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Imaculada Conceição in Prudentópolis (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,080
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 May 2014
  • i: CB, 26 Jun 2014
  • prof/sole: CB, 23 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018