Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrij Aleksander Šeptyc’kyj (Szeptycki, Sheptytsky), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1865Born
13 Aug 188924.0ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
11 Aug 189227.0Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
27 Aug 189227.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
28 Aug 189227.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
19 Jun 189933.8AppointedBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
17 Sep 189934.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
31 Oct 190035.2SelectedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
17 Dec 190035.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
17 Jan 190135.4InstalledArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
4 Nov 194479.2DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Andrij Aleksander Šeptyc’kyj (Szeptycki, Sheptytsky) (VIAF: 4978634)
Archbishop Andrij Aleksander Šeptyc’kyj (Szeptycki, Sheptytsky) O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrzyłbice

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 45.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 340, and Page 527
  • c01: CB, 13 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 May 2017