Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mychajlo Rohoza

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540²Born
27 Jul 158949.5AppointedArchbishop
1 Aug 158949.5Ordained BishopArchbishop
19 Oct 159656.7ConvertedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Aug 1599²59.5DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mychajlo Rohoza
Archbishop Mychajlo Rohoza (born 1540, died Aug 1599) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinsk, Belarus

  • a bishop for 10.0 years

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/conv: CB, 19 Jun 2015
  • bd/bp: CB, 23 Jun 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,400
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,589, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast